HI HCR36 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HCR36

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 39
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requesting The Legislative Reference Bureau To Conduct A Study Of The Necessity For The Certificate Of Need Process Under Chapter 323d, Hawaii Revised Statutes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requesting The Legislative Reference Bureau To Conduct A Study Of The Necessity For The Certificate Of Need Process Under Chapter 323d, Hawaii Revised Statutes.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-10HouseReferred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 39
2020-02-04HouseOffered
2020-02-03HouseTo be offered.

Same As/Similar To

HCR36 (Carry Over) 2019-04-22 - Resolution adopted in final form.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback