HI HCR32 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on LMG with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Holt, McKelvey excused (4).
Pending: House Legislative Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requesting The Display Of The Prisoner Of War And Missing In Action Flag At The State Capitol.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requesting The Display Of The Prisoner Of War And Missing In Action Flag At The State Capitol.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-27HouseReport adopted; referred to the committee(s) on LMG with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Holt, McKelvey excused (4).
2019-03-27HouseReported from PVM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1752), recommending referral to LMG.
2019-03-15HouseThe committees on PVM recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, Gates, D. Kobayashi, Kong, Nishimoto, Ohno, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-03-13HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by PVM on Friday, 03-15-19 10:00AM in conference room 430.
2019-03-07HouseReferred to PVM, LMG, referral sheet 27
2019-03-05HouseOffered
2019-03-01HouseTo be offered.

Same As/Similar To

HR37 (Same As) 2019-03-27 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on LMG with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Holt, McKelvey excused (4).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback