HI HCR30 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-15 - The committee(s) on WLH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requesting The Department Of Land And Natural Resources To Acquire By Eminent Domain The Seawall And The Real Property Underneath The Seawall That Is Located On Or Near The Seaward Boundaries Of Property Between 2943 Kalakaua Avenue And 3019 Kalakaua Avenue, Oahu, Hawaii.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requesting The Department Of Land And Natural Resources To Acquire By Eminent Domain The Seawall And The Real Property Underneath The Seawall That Is Located On Or Near The Seaward Boundaries Of Property Between 2943 Kalakaua Avenue And 3019 Kalakaua Avenue, Oahu, Hawaii.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-15HouseThe committee(s) on WLH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
2019-03-12HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by WLH on Friday, 03-15-19 9:30AM in conference room 325.
2019-03-07HouseReferred to WLH, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 27
2019-03-01HouseOffered
2019-02-28HouseTo be offered.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback