HI HCR26 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-23 - The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requesting That The Department Of Health Create A Formal Plan To Implement Certain Recommendations With Respect To Oral Health Care For Native Hawaiians.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requesting That The Department Of Health Create A Formal Plan To Implement Certain Recommendations With Respect To Oral Health Care For Native Hawaiians.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-23HouseThe committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
2023-03-21HouseResolution re-scheduled to be heard by HLT on Thursday, 03-23-23 10:40AM in conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
2023-03-21HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by HLT on Thursday, 03-23-23 9:30AM in conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
2023-03-03HouseReferred to HLT, FIN , referral sheet 16
2023-03-02HouseOffered
2023-02-27HouseTo be offered.

Same As/Similar To

HR28 (Same As) 2023-03-23 - The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback