HI HCR236 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-19 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-19 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting That The Department Of Education Design And Implement A Curriculum In Hawaii Public Schools That Teaches Students To Perform Cardiopulmonary Resuscitation And To Identify Symptoms Of A Stroke.
Title
Requesting That The Department Of Education Design And Implement A Curriculum In Hawaii Public Schools That Teaches Students To Perform Cardiopulmonary Resuscitation And To Identify Symptoms Of A Stroke.
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Lee [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-19 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2018-04-19 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 798). |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2018-04-18 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-19-18. |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3788) with recommendation of adoption. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Espero, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele, Dela Cruz. |
2018-04-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 04-16-18 2:45PM in conference room 312. |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Referred to EDU. |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 445). |
2018-04-04 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-04-04 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Choy, Fukumoto, Holt, C. Lee, McKelvey excused (5). |
2018-04-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1806-18), recommending adoption. |
2018-04-03 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Fukumoto, Tupola, Ward. |
2018-03-29 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 04-03-18 10:05AM in conference room 308. |
2018-03-28 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1). |
2018-03-28 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1566-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. |
2018-03-16 | House | The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Kong, Hashem, Learmont, Ohno, Onishi, Quinlan; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan, Ing, McKelvey, Matsumoto. |
2018-03-14 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by EDN on Friday, 03-16-18 2:10PM in conference room 309. |
2018-03-13 | House | Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 39 |
2018-03-09 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HR204 (Same As) 2018-04-04 - Resolution adopted in final form.