HI HCR233 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Environmental Council To Submit A Report To The Legislature On The Revision Of Environmental Impact Statement Rules, Title 11, Chapter 200, Hawaii Administrative Rules.
Title
Requesting The Environmental Council To Submit A Report To The Legislature On The Revision Of Environmental Impact Statement Rules, Title 11, Chapter 200, Hawaii Administrative Rules.
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Lee [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1). |
2018-03-28 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1531-18), recommending referral to FIN. |
2018-03-20 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Cullen, Kong, McKelvey, Todd, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee, Yamane. |
2018-03-15 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 03-20-18 9:00AM in conference room 325. |
2018-03-13 | House | Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 39 |
2018-03-09 | House | Offered |
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=233&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HCR233_.HTM |