HI HCR226 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requesting That The Comptroller Convene A Working Group To Review And Recommend Improvements To State Facilities To Maximize Health And Cognitive Function.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requesting That The Comptroller Convene A Working Group To Review And Recommend Improvements To State Facilities To Maximize Health And Cognitive Function.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-29SenateThe committee on CPH deferred the measure.
2019-04-29SenateThe committee on GVO deferred the measure.
2019-04-24SenateThe committee(s) on GVO/CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 04-29-19 2:00PM in conference room 224.
2019-04-09SenateReferred to GVO/CPH.
2019-04-05SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 636).
2019-04-04HouseTransmitted to Senate.
2019-04-04HouseAdopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nishimoto, Quinlan excused (2).
2019-04-04HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2029), recommending adoption.
2019-04-03HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Gates, Holt.
2019-04-01HouseScheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 04-03-19 11:30AM in conference room 308.
2019-03-27HouseReport adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Holt, McKelvey excused (4).
2019-03-27HouseReported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1772) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN.
2019-03-19HouseThe committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Eli, Ichiyama, Kitagawa, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) McKelvey, Quinlan.
2019-03-15HouseResolution re-scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 03-19-19 9:35AM in conference room 309.
2019-03-15HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 03-19-19 9:00AM in conference room 309.
2019-03-14HouseReferred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 33
2019-03-08HouseOffered

Same As/Similar To

HR201 (Same As) 2019-04-04 - Resolution adopted in final form.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback