HI HCR224 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Convening A Digital Gaming Advisory Group To Assess And Monitor Gambling Practices In The Digital Gaming Industry.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Convening A Digital Gaming Advisory Group To Assess And Monitor Gambling Practices In The Digital Gaming Industry.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-30HouseResolution adopted in final form.
2019-05-02SenateReceived notice of Adoption in House (Hse. Com. No. 884).
2019-04-30HouseAdopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
2019-04-30HouseHouse agrees to Senate amendment(s).
2019-04-22HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 945) in amended form (SD 1).
2019-04-22SenateReport and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House.
2019-04-22SenateReported from GVO/JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2229) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1).
2019-04-18SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai, Fevella.
2019-04-18SenateThe committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) L. Thielen, Baker, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye, Fevella.
2019-04-15SenateThe committee(s) on GVO/JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 04-18-19 2:45PM in conference room 325.
2019-04-09SenateReferred to GVO/JDC.
2019-04-05SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 635).
2019-04-04HouseTransmitted to Senate.
2019-04-04HouseAdopted as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nishimoto, Quinlan excused (2).
2019-04-04HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2060) as amended in HD 1, recommending adoption.
2019-04-03HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Lowen, McKelvey, Morikawa, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Say; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan.
2019-04-01HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by JUD on Wednesday, 04-03-19 2:00PM in conference room 325.
2019-03-14HouseReferred to JUD, referral sheet 33
2019-03-08HouseOffered

Same As/Similar To

HR199 (Same As) 2019-04-04 - Resolution adopted in final form.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback