HI HCR223 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Department Of Education To Offer Vegetarian Lunch Meals In All Public Schools At Least Once Weekly.
Title
Urging The Department Of Education To Offer Vegetarian Lunch Meals In All Public Schools At Least Once Weekly.
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Rep. Tom Brower [D] | Rep. Lynn Decoite [D] | Rep. Stacelynn Eli [D] |
Rep. Lisa Kitagawa [D] | Rep. John Mizuno [D] | Rep. Justin Woodson [D] | Rep. Roy Takumi [D] |
Rep. Kyle Yamashita [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-06 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2019-03-28 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2). |
2019-03-28 | House | Reported from LHE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1788) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. |
2019-03-18 | House | The committees on LHE recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Perruso, DeCoite, D. Kobayashi, Ohno, Quinlan, Tarnas; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem, Johanson, Tokioka, Okimoto. |
2019-03-14 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by LHE on Monday, 03-18-19 2:00PM in conference room 309. |
2019-03-14 | House | Referred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 33 |
2019-03-08 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HR198 (Same As) 2019-03-28 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).