HI HCR221 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-03 - Referred to EDU.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-03 - Referred to EDU.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizing February 19 Through February 23, 2024, As Scholastic Journalism Week In Hawaii.
Title
Recognizing February 19 Through February 23, 2024, As Scholastic Journalism Week In Hawaii.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-03 | Senate | Referred to EDU. |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 495). |
2024-04-01 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2024-04-01 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, Quinlan excused (2). |
2024-04-01 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1574-24), recommending adoption. |
2024-03-21 | House | The committee on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, La Chica, Kapela, Marten, M. Mizuno, Perruso, Quinlan, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Martinez, Matayoshi, Todd. |
2024-03-19 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by EDN on Thursday, 03-21-24 2:00PM in conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-03-14 | House | Referred to EDN, referral sheet 22 |
2024-03-08 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HR201 (Same As) 2024-04-01 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=221&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HCR221_.HTM |