HI HCR205 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-27 - (H) Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-27 - (H) Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Health To Establish A Task Force Regarding The Implementation Of Act 1, Session Laws Of Hawaii 2011.
Title
Civil Unions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-27 | (H) Resolution adopted in final form. | |
2011-04-27 | (H) Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 675). | |
2011-04-27 | (S) Resolution Adopted. Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Gabbard). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-04-26 | (S) One Day Notice 04-27-11. | |
2011-04-26 | (S) Waived referral to HTH. | |
2011-04-19 | (S) Referred to HTH. | |
2011-04-18 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 628). | |
2011-04-15 | (H) Transmitted to Senate. | |
2011-04-15 | (H) Adopted with none voting no and Chong, Herkes, Kawakami, McKelvey, Thielen, Tokioka excused. | |
2011-04-15 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1676), recommending adoption. | |
2011-04-13 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Choy, Cullen, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, C. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 6 Excused: Representative(s) Chong, Har, Kawakami, Marumoto, Riviere, Ward. | |
2011-04-11 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 04-13-11 10:00AM in conference room 308. | |
2011-04-01 | (H) Re-referred to FIN, referral sheet 51 | |
2011-03-21 | (H) Referred to HLT, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 43 | |
2011-03-16 | (H) Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HR177 (Same As) 2011-04-15 - (H) Resolution adopted in final form.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/lists/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=205 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/Bills/HCR205_.HTM |