HI HCR202 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-21 - The committee(s) on TOU recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requesting The Auditor To Conduct A Management Audit Of The Hawaii Tourism Authority.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requesting The Auditor To Conduct A Management Audit Of The Hawaii Tourism Authority.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-21HouseThe committee(s) on TOU recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
2017-03-17HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by TOU on Tuesday, 03-21-17 9:00AM in conference room 429.
2017-03-14HouseReferred to TOU, FIN, referral sheet 30
2017-03-10HouseOffered

Same As/Similar To

HR130 (Same As) 2017-03-21 - The committee(s) on TOU recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback