HI HCR20 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HCR20
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-1)
Status: Passed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-20 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-1)
Status: Passed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-20 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting An Increased Honolulu Police Department Presence In Waianae, The North Shore Of Oahu, Chinatown And Downtown Honolulu Areas.
Title
Requesting An Increased Honolulu Police Department Presence In Waianae, The North Shore Of Oahu, Chinatown And Downtown Honolulu Areas.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-20 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Received notice of Adoption in House (Hse. Com. No. 634). |
2018-04-20 | House | Adopted as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ing excused (1). |
2018-04-20 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2018-04-18 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 792) in amended form (SD 1). |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. |
2018-04-17 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-18-18. |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3778) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2018-04-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, L. Thielen. |
2018-04-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 04-13-18 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Referred to PSM. |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 418). |
2018-04-04 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-04-04 | House | Adopted as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Choy, Fukumoto, Holt, C. Lee, McKelvey excused (5). |
2018-04-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1810-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending adoption. |
2018-04-03 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Fukumoto, Tupola, Ward. |
2018-03-29 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 04-03-18 10:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2018-02-08 | House | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 18 |
2018-02-05 | House | Offered |
2018-02-02 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR16 (Same As) 2018-04-04 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HCR20 (Carry Over) 2017-03-24 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Har, Ichiyama, C. Lee, Souki, Thielen excused (7).
HCR20 (Carry Over) 2017-03-24 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Har, Ichiyama, C. Lee, Souki, Thielen excused (7).