HI HCR197 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on CPC as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Holt, McKelvey excused (4).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requesting A Study That Summarizes The Published Reports And Studies On The Effects Of 5g Wireless Technology On Biological Life.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requesting A Study That Summarizes The Published Reports And Studies On The Effects Of 5g Wireless Technology On Biological Life.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-27HouseReport adopted. referred to the committee(s) on CPC as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Holt, McKelvey excused (4).
2019-03-27HouseReported from EEP/IAC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1748) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to CPC.
2019-03-21HouseThe committees on IAC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Ohno, D. Kobayashi, Gates, Kong, Nishimoto, Takayama; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
2019-03-21HouseThe committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Wildberger, Har, Tarnas, Todd, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Yamane.
2019-03-19HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by EEP/IAC on Thursday, 03-21-19 11:45AM in conference room 325.
2019-03-14HouseReferred to EEP/IAC, CPC, referral sheet 33
2019-03-08HouseOffered

Same As/Similar To

HR178 (Same As) 2019-03-27 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on CPC as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Holt, McKelvey excused (4).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback