HI HCR195 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-2)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Creagan, Eli, Holt, Nakamura, Quinlan excused (6).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Convening A Working Group To Discuss Local Issues Surrounding Waste Reduction.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Convening A Working Group To Discuss Local Issues Surrounding Waste Reduction.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-25HouseReport adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Creagan, Eli, Holt, Nakamura, Quinlan excused (6).
2019-03-25HouseReported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1707), recommending referral to FIN.
2019-03-19HouseThe committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Wildberger, Har, Tarnas, Todd, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Yamane.
2019-03-15HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 03-19-19 9:30AM in conference room 325.
2019-03-14HouseReferred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 33
2019-03-08HouseOffered

Same As/Similar To

HR176 (Same As) 2019-03-25 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Creagan, Eli, Holt, Nakamura, Quinlan excused (6).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback