HI HCR190 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-24 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-24 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Strongly Urging The United States Department Of The Interior And The United States Congress To Provide Additional Federal Aid And Support To The State Of Hawaii For Financial, Medical, And Other Federal Assistance For Migrants Covered By The Compact Of Free Association.
Title
Strongly Urging The United States Department Of The Interior And The United States Congress To Provide Additional Federal Aid And Support To The State Of Hawaii For Financial, Medical, And Other Federal Assistance For Migrants Covered By The Compact Of Free Association.
Sponsors
Rep. John Mizuno [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-22 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-24 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2021-03-24 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1249), recommending referral to FIN. |
2021-03-22 | House | The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Takumi, Todd, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nakamura. |
2021-03-18 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by JHA on Monday, 03-22-21 2:15PM in conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-15 | House | Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 25 |
2021-03-12 | House | Offered |