HI HCR19 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-22 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizing The Issuance Of A Term, Non-exclusive Easement Covering A Portion Of State Submerged Lands At Kaalawai, Honolulu, Oahu, For The Existing Seawall And Steps, And For Use, Repair, And Maintenance Of The Existing Improvements Constructed Thereon.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing The Issuance Of A Term, Non-exclusive Easement Covering A Portion Of State Submerged Lands At Kaalawai, Honolulu, Oahu, For The Existing Seawall And Steps, And For Use, Repair, And Maintenance Of The Existing Improvements Constructed Thereon.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-22HouseResolution adopted in final form.
2019-04-22HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 922).
2019-04-22SenateReport and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House.
2019-04-22SenateReported from WTL/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2226) with recommendation of adoption.
2019-04-17SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, English, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 6 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Harimoto, Moriwaki, Riviere, Taniguchi, Fevella.
2019-04-17SenateThe committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WTL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Nishihara, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Riviere.
2019-04-16SenateThe committee(s) on WTL/WAM added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 04-17-19 10:30AM in conference room 211.
2019-04-09SenateReferred to WTL/WAM.
2019-04-05SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 596).
2019-04-04HouseAdopted with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Perruso, Thielen, Wildberger voting no (3) and Representative(s) Nishimoto, Quinlan excused (2).
2019-04-04HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2012), recommending adoption.
2019-04-03HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Gates, Holt.
2019-04-01HouseScheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 04-03-19 11:30AM in conference room 308.
2019-03-27HouseReport adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Perruso, Thielen, Wildberger voting no (3) and Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Holt, McKelvey excused (4).
2019-03-27HouseReported from WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1775), recommending referral to FIN.
2019-03-15HouseThe committees on WLH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Har, Lowen, Tarnas; Ayes with reservations: none; 2 Noes: Representative(s) Wildberger, Thielen; and Excused: none.
2019-03-12HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by WLH on Friday, 03-15-19 9:30AM in conference room 325.
2019-03-07HouseReferred to WLH, FIN, referral sheet 27
2019-02-19HouseOffered
2019-02-15HouseTo be offered.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback