HI HCR187 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requesting The Various Government Entities Responsible For Inspecting Cargo Shipments To Hawaii To Coordinate Their Efforts To Ensure That Every Shipping Container Originating From Outside The State Is Inspected For Illegal Goods.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requesting The Various Government Entities Responsible For Inspecting Cargo Shipments To Hawaii To Coordinate Their Efforts To Ensure That Every Shipping Container Originating From Outside The State Is Inspected For Illegal Goods.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-03HouseThe committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
2019-04-02HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by JUD on Wednesday, 04-03-19 2:00PM in conference room 325.
2019-03-28HouseReport adopted. referred to the committee(s) on JUD as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).
2019-03-28HouseReported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1823) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to JUD.
2019-03-22HouseThe committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Hashimoto, Brower, Hashem, Matayoshi, Woodson, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cullen.
2019-03-19HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by TRN on Friday, 03-22-19 10:00AM in conference room 423.
2019-03-19HouseRe-referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 37
2019-03-14HouseReferred to TRN/WLH, JUD, referral sheet 33
2019-03-08HouseOffered

Same As/Similar To

HR169 (Same As) 2019-04-03 - The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback