HI HCR186 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HCR186

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Wednesday 03-18-20 10:00AM in conference room 325.
Pending: House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urging The Department Of Environmental Services Refuse Division Of The City And County Of Honolulu To Solve Its Ongoing Maintenance And Communication Problems At The Waianae Convenience Center.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urging The Department Of Environmental Services Refuse Division Of The City And County Of Honolulu To Solve Its Ongoing Maintenance And Communication Problems At The Waianae Convenience Center.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-16HouseThis measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Wednesday 03-18-20 10:00AM in conference room 325.
2020-03-13HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by WLH on Wednesday, 03-18-20 10:00AM in conference room 325.
2020-03-11HouseReferred to WLH, FIN, referral sheet 40
2020-03-06HouseOffered

Same As/Similar To

HR165 (Same As) 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Wednesday 03-18-20 10:00AM in conference room 325.
HCR186 (Carry Over) 2019-03-14 - Referred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 33

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback