HI HCR182 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-20 - The committee(s) on PVM recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Public Safety, Veterans, & Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urging The United States Government And Hunt Companies To Reserve The Ewa Field Land To Preserve World War Ii Historic And Hawaiian Cultural Sites At The Former Marine Corps Air Station Ewa For The Creation Of The Ewa Battlefield Memorial Park.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urging The United States Government And Hunt Companies To Reserve The Ewa Field Land To Preserve World War Ii Historic And Hawaiian Cultural Sites At The Former Marine Corps Air Station Ewa For The Creation Of The Ewa Battlefield Memorial Park.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-20HouseThe committee(s) on PVM recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
2019-03-18HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by PVM on Wednesday, 03-20-19 11:00AM in conference room 430.
2019-03-14HouseReferred to PVM, FIN, referral sheet 33
2019-03-08HouseOffered

Same As/Similar To

HR164 (Same As) 2019-03-20 - The committee(s) on PVM recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback