HI HCR179 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-22 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requesting The University Of Hawaii Board Of Regents To Continue To Support And Fund The Industrial Relations Center As A Valuable Labor-management Relations Resource For The Public And Private Sectors.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requesting The University Of Hawaii Board Of Regents To Continue To Support And Fund The Industrial Relations Center As A Valuable Labor-management Relations Resource For The Public And Private Sectors.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-22HouseResolution adopted in final form.
2019-04-22HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 930).
2019-04-22SenateReport and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House.
2019-04-18SenateOne Day Notice 04-22-19.
2019-04-18SenateReported from HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2179) with recommendation of adoption.
2019-04-15SenateThe committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HRE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Kidani, K. Kahele, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran.
2019-04-11SenateThe committee(s) on HRE added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 04-15-19 2:00PM in conference room 414.
2019-04-09SenateReferred to HRE.
2019-04-05SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 626).
2019-04-04HouseTransmitted to Senate.
2019-04-04HouseAdopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nishimoto, Quinlan excused (2).
2019-04-04HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2006), recommending adoption.
2019-04-03HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Gates, Holt.
2019-04-01HouseScheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 04-03-19 11:30AM in conference room 308.
2019-03-25HouseReport adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Creagan, Eli, Holt, Nakamura, Quinlan excused (6).
2019-03-25HouseReported from LAB/LHE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1713), recommending referral to FIN.
2019-03-18HouseThe committees on LHE recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Perruso, Johanson, D. Kobayashi, Ohno, Tarnas, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem, DeCoite, Quinlan, Tokioka.
2019-03-18HouseThe committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Eli, Ichiyama, Kitagawa, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) McKelvey, Quinlan.
2019-03-15HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by LAB/LHE on Monday, 03-18-19 2:10PM in conference room 309.
2019-03-14HouseReferred to LAB/LHE, FIN, referral sheet 33
2019-03-08HouseOffered

Same As/Similar To

HR161 (Same As) 2019-04-04 - Resolution adopted in final form.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback