HI HCR178 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HCR178
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-23 - Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 626).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-23 - Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 626).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Convening Of A Working Group To Discuss The Role Of The Authorizer, Its Relationship With Charter Schools, The Accountability For The Use Of Public Funds, And Whether Or Not Legislation Is Required To Effectuate Any Desired Changes.
Title
Requesting The Convening Of A Working Group To Discuss The Role Of The Authorizer, Its Relationship With Charter Schools, The Accountability For The Use Of Public Funds, And Whether Or Not Legislation Is Required To Effectuate Any Desired Changes.
Sponsors
Rep. Amy Perruso [D] | Rep. Patrick Branco [D] | Rep. Ernesto Ganaden [D] | Rep. Jeanne Kapela [D] |
Rep. Matthew Lopresti [D] | Rep. Lisa Marten [D] | Rep. Justin Woodson [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-16 - Senate - Senate Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - House Education: Passed, Unamended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - House Education: Passed, Unamended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-23 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 626). |
2021-04-22 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2021-04-19 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 838) in amended form (SD 1). |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted as amended (SD 1). Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Acasio, San Buenaventura. Noes, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1792) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2021-04-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Dela Cruz, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 04-16-21 3:00PM; CR 229 & Videoconference. |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Re-Referred to EDU. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Referred to EDU, WAM. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 387). |
2021-03-31 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2021-03-31 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, Ohno excused (2). |
2021-03-31 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1578), recommending adoption. |
2021-03-30 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Yamashita, McDermott. |
2021-03-29 | House | Re-scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 03-30-21 11:00AM in conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-25 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 03-30-21 11:00AM in conference room 309 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-23 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1). |
2021-03-23 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1187), recommending referral to FIN. |
2021-03-18 | House | The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Kapela, Belatti, Ganaden, Hashimoto, Ohno, Quinlan, Takayama; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) DeCoite, Okimoto; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Gates, Yamane. |
2021-03-16 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by EDN on Thursday, 03-18-21 2:00PM in conference room 309 & 430 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-15 | House | Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 25 |
2021-03-12 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HCR178 (Carry Over) 2021-04-23 - Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 626).
HR147 (Same As) 2021-03-31 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HR147 (Same As) 2021-03-31 - Resolution adopted in final form.