HI HCR178 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-3)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-01 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Wednesday 04-03-19 2:00PM in conference room 325.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urging The Real Estate Commission To Develop Training For Condominium Association Board Members.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urging The Real Estate Commission To Develop Training For Condominium Association Board Members.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-01HouseThis measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Wednesday 04-03-19 2:00PM in conference room 325.
2019-04-01HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by JUD on Wednesday, 04-03-19 2:00PM in conference room 325.
2019-03-28HouseReport adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).
2019-03-28HouseReported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1806), recommending referral to JUD.
2019-03-21HouseThe committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Cachola, Har, Kong, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Cabanilla Arakawa, Mizuno.
2019-03-18HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 03-21-19 2:00PM in conference room 329.
2019-03-14HouseReferred to CPC, JUD, referral sheet 33
2019-03-08HouseOffered

Same As/Similar To

HR160 (Same As) 2019-04-01 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Wednesday 04-03-19 2:00PM in conference room 325.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback