HI HCR167 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HCR167
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-29 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JHA with Representative(s) Matsumoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Okimoto, Ward voting no (3) and Representative(s) Eli, Todd, Woodson, Yamane excused (4).
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-29 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JHA with Representative(s) Matsumoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Okimoto, Ward voting no (3) and Representative(s) Eli, Todd, Woodson, Yamane excused (4).
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging Members Of The United States Congress To Enact Federal Legislation Granting Statehood To The People Of Washington, D.c.
Title
Urging Members Of The United States Congress To Enact Federal Legislation Granting Statehood To The People Of Washington, D.c.
Sponsors
Rep. Matthew Lopresti [D] | Rep. Patrick Branco [D] | Rep. Jeanne Kapela [D] | Rep. Nicole Lowen [D] |
Rep. Lisa Marten [D] | Rep. Amy Perruso [D] | Rep. Adrian Tam [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-23 - House - House Culture, Arts, & International Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-29 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JHA with Representative(s) Matsumoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Okimoto, Ward voting no (3) and Representative(s) Eli, Todd, Woodson, Yamane excused (4). |
2022-03-29 | House | Reported from CAI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1504-22), recommending referral to JHA. |
2022-03-23 | House | The committees on CAI recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Gates, Tam, Har, Kapela, Nishimoto, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ward; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-03-18 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by CAI on Wednesday, 03-23-22 10:40AM in conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-14 | House | Referred to CAI, JHA, referral sheet 27 |
2022-03-11 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HR167 (Same As) 2022-03-29 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JHA with Representative(s) Matsumoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Okimoto, Ward voting no (3) and Representative(s) Eli, Todd, Woodson, Yamane excused (4).
HCR167 (Carry Over) 2021-03-24 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
HCR167 (Carry Over) 2021-03-24 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).