HI HCR165 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HCR165
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-29 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Kapela voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Todd, Woodson, Yamane excused (4).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-29 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Kapela voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Todd, Woodson, Yamane excused (4).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Office Of Enterprise Technology Services To Develop A Recommended Definition For Blockchain Technology And Recommendations For Opportunities For Individuals, Private Entities, And State Agencies To Use Blockchain Technology.
Title
Requesting The Office Of Enterprise Technology Services To Develop A Recommended Definition For Blockchain Technology And Recommendations For Opportunities For Individuals, Private Entities, And State Agencies To Use Blockchain Technology.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-23 - House - House Higher Education & Technology: Passed, Unamended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-29 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Kapela voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Todd, Woodson, Yamane excused (4). |
2022-03-29 | House | Reported from HET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1477-22), recommending referral to CPC. |
2022-03-23 | House | The committees on HET recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, Clark, Belatti, Costales, Ganaden, Gates, Hashimoto, Yamane, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Kapela; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Ohno, Quinlan, Woodson. |
2022-03-21 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HET on Wednesday, 03-23-22 2:00PM in conference room 309 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-14 | House | Referred to HET, CPC, referral sheet 27 |
2022-03-11 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HR165 (Same As) 2022-03-29 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Kapela voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Todd, Woodson, Yamane excused (4).
HCR165 (Carry Over) 2021-03-15 - Referred to LAT, FIN, referral sheet 25
HCR165 (Carry Over) 2021-03-15 - Referred to LAT, FIN, referral sheet 25