HI HCR162 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HCR162
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-09 - Referred to TRS/PSM.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-09 - Referred to TRS/PSM.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Transportation To Collaborate With The City And County Of Honolulu Department Of Transportation Services And Appropriate Private Entities To Conduct A Study To Enhance Pedestrian Safety At The Intersection Of Ala Moana Boulevard And Kamakee Street.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Transportation To Collaborate With The City And County Of Honolulu Department Of Transportation Services And Appropriate Private Entities To Conduct A Study To Enhance Pedestrian Safety At The Intersection Of Ala Moana Boulevard And Kamakee Street.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] | Rep. Della au Belatti [D] | Rep. Tom Brower [D] | Rep. Daniel Holt [D] |
Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Rep. Sylvia Luke [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-09 | Senate | Referred to TRS/PSM. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 623). |
2019-04-04 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-04-04 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nishimoto, Quinlan excused (2). |
2019-04-04 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2046), recommending adoption. |
2019-04-03 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Lowen, McKelvey, Morikawa, Say, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan. |
2019-04-01 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by JUD on Wednesday, 04-03-19 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2019-03-28 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on JUD as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2). |
2019-03-28 | House | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1815) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to JUD. |
2019-03-22 | House | The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Hashimoto, Brower, Hashem, Matayoshi, Woodson, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cullen. |
2019-03-19 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by TRN on Friday, 03-22-19 10:00AM in conference room 423. |
2019-03-14 | House | Referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 33 |
2019-03-08 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HCR162 (Carry Over) 2019-04-09 - Referred to TRS/PSM.
HR145 (Same As) 2019-04-04 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HR145 (Same As) 2019-04-04 - Resolution adopted in final form.