HI HCR161 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requesting The Hawaii Community Development Authority To Study Properties In Or Around Kakaako To Recommend Appropriate Sites For A New Fire Station Or, Alternatively, To Identify Existing Fire Stations That May Be Relocated Or Expanded To More Effectively Serve The Kakaako Community.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requesting The Hawaii Community Development Authority To Study Properties In Or Around Kakaako To Recommend Appropriate Sites For A New Fire Station Or, Alternatively, To Identify Existing Fire Stations That May Be Relocated Or Expanded To More Effectively Serve The Kakaako Community.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-24HouseResolution adopted in final form.
2019-04-24HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 956).
2019-04-24SenateReport and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House.
2019-04-23SenateOne Day Notice 04-24-19.
2019-04-23SenateReported from HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2236) with recommendation of adoption.
2019-04-18SenateThe committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HOU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) S. Chang, Moriwaki, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kanuha, L. Thielen.
2019-04-15SenateThe committee(s) on HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 04-18-19 2:45PM in conference room 423.
2019-04-09SenateReferred to HOU.
2019-04-05SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 622).
2019-04-04HouseTransmitted to Senate.
2019-04-04HouseAdopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nishimoto, Quinlan excused (2).
2019-04-04HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2009), recommending adoption.
2019-04-03HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Gates, Holt.
2019-04-01HouseScheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 04-03-19 11:30AM in conference room 308.
2019-03-27HouseReport adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Holt, McKelvey excused (4).
2019-03-27HouseReported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1726) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN.
2019-03-21HouseThe committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Matayoshi, Cullen, Hashem, Hashimoto, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, McDermott.
2019-03-18HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by HSG on Thursday, 03-21-19 10:35AM in conference room 423.
2019-03-14HouseReferred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 33
2019-03-08HouseOffered

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback