HI HCR16 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-2)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Holt, McKelvey excused (4).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Designating March As Bleeding Disorders Awareness Month.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designating March As Bleeding Disorders Awareness Month.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-27HouseReport adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Holt, McKelvey excused (4).
2019-03-27HouseReported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1728) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN.
2019-03-21HouseThe committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Nakamura, San Buenaventura, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Say, Ward.
2019-03-18HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by HLT on Thursday, 03-21-19 8:30AM in conference room 329.
2019-03-07HouseReferred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 27
2019-02-07HouseOffered
2019-02-06HouseTo be offered.

Same As/Similar To

HR17 (Same As) 2019-03-27 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Holt, McKelvey excused (4).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback