HI HCR145 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Urging The Department Of Human Services To Conduct A Full Study On The Reimplementation Of Adult Dental Benefits For Hawaii Residents Who Are Medicaid Enrollees And To Submit A Report To The Legislature.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urging The Department Of Human Services To Conduct A Full Study On The Reimplementation Of Adult Dental Benefits For Hawaii Residents Who Are Medicaid Enrollees And To Submit A Report To The Legislature.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-28HouseReport adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).
2019-03-28HouseReported from HSH/HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1883) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN.
2019-03-22HouseThe committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Belatti, Nakamura, San Buenaventura, Say, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka.
2019-03-22HouseThe committees on HSH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Nakamura, Belatti, B. Kobayashi, Mizuno, Say, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka.
2019-03-19HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by HSH/HLT on Friday, 03-22-19 9:00AM in conference room 329.
2019-03-14HouseReferred to HSH/HLT, FIN, referral sheet 33
2019-03-08HouseOffered

Same As/Similar To

HR134 (Same As) 2019-03-28 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback