HI HCR140 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on April 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-27 - (H) Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on April 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-27 - (H) Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Director Of The Office Of Aerospace Development To Coordinate Comments And Identify A Lead Entity To Prepare A Proposal, On Behalf Of The State, For Hawaii To Be Selected As One Of The Federal Aviation Administration's Six Unmanned Aircraft System Test Sites.
Title
Unmanned Aircraft System Test Site; Federal Aviation Administration
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-27 | (H) Resolution adopted in final form. | |
2012-04-27 | (H) Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 822). | |
2012-04-27 | (S) Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. | |
2012-04-26 | (S) One Day Notice 04-27-12. | |
2012-04-26 | (S) Waived referral to PGM/EDT. | |
2012-04-16 | (S) Referred to PGM/EDT. | |
2012-04-16 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 592). | |
2012-04-13 | (H) Transmitted to Senate. | |
2012-04-13 | (H) Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Chang, Kawakami, Oshiro, Tokioka excused (4). | |
2012-04-13 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1742-12), recommending adoption. | |
2012-04-11 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Oshiro, M. Lee, Choy, Cullen, Giugni, Har, Hashem, C. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita, Marumoto, Riviere, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Ichiyama, Jordan, Kawakami. | |
2012-04-09 | (H) Scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 04-11-12 11:15AM in conference room 308. | |
2012-04-03 | (H) Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cabanilla, Carroll, Mizuno, Thielen excused (4). | |
2012-04-03 | (H) Reported from ERB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1455-12) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. | |
2012-03-29 | (H) The committees on ERB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: McKelvey, Choy, Awana, Evans, Hashem, Tsuji, Marumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Brower, Nishimoto, Tokioka, Pine. | |
2012-03-27 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by ERB on Thursday, 03-29-12 8:30AM in conference room 312. | |
2012-03-15 | (H) Referred to ERB, FIN, referral sheet 47 | |
2012-03-14 | (H) Offered | |
2012-03-13 | (H) To be offered. |