HI HCR138 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Referred to TRS/PSM.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urging The County Of Hawaii To Create Alternate Routes To Properties In The Puna District That Were Affected, But Not Destroyed, By The 2018 Kilauea Eruption.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urging The County Of Hawaii To Create Alternate Routes To Properties In The Puna District That Were Affected, But Not Destroyed, By The 2018 Kilauea Eruption.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-09SenateReferred to TRS/PSM.
2019-04-05SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 618).
2019-04-04HouseTransmitted to Senate.
2019-04-04HouseAdopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nishimoto, Quinlan excused (2).
2019-04-04HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2002), recommending adoption.
2019-04-03HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Gates, Holt.
2019-04-01HouseScheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 04-03-19 11:30AM in conference room 308.
2019-03-27HouseReport adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Holt, McKelvey excused (4).
2019-03-27HouseReported from PVM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1750), recommending referral to FIN.
2019-03-20HouseThe committees on PVM recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, Gates, D. Kobayashi, Kong, Nishimoto, Ohno, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2019-03-18HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by PVM on Wednesday, 03-20-19 11:00AM in conference room 430.
2019-03-14HouseReferred to PVM, FIN, referral sheet 33
2019-03-08HouseOffered

Same As/Similar To

HR127 (Same As) 2019-04-04 - Resolution adopted in final form.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback