HI HCR137 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-22 - Re-referred to FIN, referral sheet 57
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requesting The Department Of Budget And Finance To Inform The President Of The Senate And The Speaker Of The House Of Representatives Within Seven Days Of The Issuance Of Special Purpose Revenue Bonds.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requesting The Department Of Budget And Finance To Inform The President Of The Senate And The Speaker Of The House Of Representatives Within Seven Days Of The Issuance Of Special Purpose Revenue Bonds.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-22HouseRe-referred to FIN, referral sheet 57
2019-04-18HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 912) in amended form (SD 1).
2019-04-18SenateReport and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House.
2019-04-17SenateOne Day Notice 04-18-19.
2019-04-17SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2175) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1).
2019-04-15SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, K. Kahele, Riviere, Taniguchi.
2019-04-12SenateThe committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 04-15-19 10:55AM in conference room 211.
2019-04-12SenateRe-Referred to WAM.
2019-04-09SenateReferred to EET/WAM.
2019-04-05SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 617).
2019-04-04HouseTransmitted to Senate.
2019-04-04HouseAdopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nishimoto, Quinlan excused (2).
2019-04-04HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2000), recommending adoption.
2019-04-03HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Gates, Holt.
2019-04-01HouseScheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 04-03-19 11:30AM in conference room 308.
2019-03-25HouseReport adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Creagan, Eli, Holt, Nakamura, Quinlan excused (6).
2019-03-25HouseReported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1705), recommending referral to FIN.
2019-03-19HouseThe committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Wildberger, Har, Tarnas, Todd, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Yamane.
2019-03-15HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 03-19-19 9:30AM in conference room 325.
2019-03-14HouseReferred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 33
2019-03-08HouseOffered

Same As/Similar To

HR126 (Same As) 2019-04-04 - Resolution adopted in final form.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback