HI HCR136 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - The committee(s) on AGR/LMG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requesting The Auditor To Assess The Proposed Regulation Of Pet Boarding Facilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requesting The Auditor To Assess The Proposed Regulation Of Pet Boarding Facilities.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-21HouseThe committee(s) on AGR/LMG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
2019-03-19HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by AGR/LMG on Thursday, 03-21-19 3:00PM in conference room 312.
2019-03-14HouseReferred to AGR/LMG, FIN, referral sheet 33
2019-03-08HouseOffered

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback