HI HCR134 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requesting The Auditor To Conduct A Follow-up Analysis To Sunrise Analysis: Check Cashing And Deferred Deposit Agreements (payday Loans), Report No. 05-11.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requesting The Auditor To Conduct A Follow-up Analysis To Sunrise Analysis: Check Cashing And Deferred Deposit Agreements (payday Loans), Report No. 05-11.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-28HouseReport adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).
2019-03-28HouseReported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1808), recommending referral to FIN.
2019-03-21HouseThe committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Cachola, Har, Kong, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Cabanilla Arakawa, Mizuno.
2019-03-18HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 03-21-19 2:00PM in conference room 329.
2019-03-14HouseReferred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 33
2019-03-08HouseOffered

Same As/Similar To

HR124 (Same As) 2019-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback