HI HCR133 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-22 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requesting The Probate Court To Increase Transparency Regarding The Kamehameha Schools Trustee Selection Process.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requesting The Probate Court To Increase Transparency Regarding The Kamehameha Schools Trustee Selection Process.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-22HouseResolution adopted in final form.
2019-04-22HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 929).
2019-04-22SenateReport and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House.
2019-04-18SenateOne Day Notice 04-22-19.
2019-04-18SenateReported from HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2183) with recommendation of adoption.
2019-04-16SenateThe committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HWN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, J.Keohokalole, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele, Ihara.
2019-04-11SenateRe-Referred to HWN.
2019-04-10SenateThe committee(s) on HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 04-16-19 1:15PM in conference room 414.
2019-04-03SenateReferred to HWN/JDC.
2019-04-03SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 527).
2019-04-02HouseTransmitted to Senate.
2019-04-02HouseAdopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Saiki, Todd, Yamane excused (4).
2019-04-02HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1947), recommending adoption.
2019-03-22HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Lowen, McKelvey, Morikawa, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan, Say, Yamane.
2019-03-20HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 03-22-19 2:10PM in conference room 325.
2019-03-14HouseReferred to JUD, referral sheet 33
2019-03-08HouseOffered

Same As/Similar To

HR123 (Same As) 2019-04-02 - Resolution adopted in final form.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback