HI HCR132 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-28 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on CPC as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, Ichiyama, Kila, Lowen, Tam excused (5).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-28 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on CPC as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, Ichiyama, Kila, Lowen, Tam excused (5).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Counties To Adopt An Ordinance Requiring Restaurants And Other Food Service Establishments To Take Steps To Make Their Businesses Safe For Members Of The Public With Severe Food Allergies.
Title
Urging The Counties To Adopt An Ordinance Requiring Restaurants And Other Food Service Establishments To Take Steps To Make Their Businesses Safe For Members Of The Public With Severe Food Allergies.
Sponsors
Rep. Micah Aiu [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-28 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on CPC as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, Ichiyama, Kila, Lowen, Tam excused (5). |
2024-03-28 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1528-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to CPC. |
2024-03-27 | House | The committee on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Takenouchi, Amato, Ilagan, Marten, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Kobayashi, Nishimoto. |
2024-03-20 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HLT on Wednesday, 03-27-24 11:10AM in conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-03-13 | House | Referred to HLT, CPC, referral sheet 21 |
2024-03-08 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HR113 (Same As) 2024-03-28 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on CPC as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, Ichiyama, Kila, Lowen, Tam excused (5).