HI HCR13 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Cachola voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Creagan, Eli, Holt, Nakamura, Quinlan excused (6).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urging Hawaiian Airlines To Cease Outsourcing Call Center Operations To The Philippines And To Return These Operations To Hawaii.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urging Hawaiian Airlines To Cease Outsourcing Call Center Operations To The Philippines And To Return These Operations To Hawaii.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-25HouseReport adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Cachola voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Creagan, Eli, Holt, Nakamura, Quinlan excused (6).
2019-03-25HouseReported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1719), recommending referral to FIN.
2019-03-19HouseThe committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Eli, Ichiyama, Kitagawa, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) McKelvey, Quinlan.
2019-03-15HouseResolution re-scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 03-19-19 9:35AM in conference room 309.
2019-03-15HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 03-19-19 9:00AM in conference room 309.
2019-02-11HouseReferred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 20
2019-02-04HouseOffered
2019-02-01HouseTo be offered.

Same As/Similar To

HR11 (Same As) 2019-03-25 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Cachola voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Creagan, Eli, Holt, Nakamura, Quinlan excused (6).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback