HI HCR124 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HCR124
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Referred to HSG, CPC, referral sheet 40
Pending: House Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Referred to HSG, CPC, referral sheet 40
Pending: House Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Director Of Commerce And Consumer Affairs To Determine The Number Of Multiunit Buildings With Smoke-free Policies, Including Condominiums And Apartment Buildings, And Examine The Types Of Smoke-free Policies In Use.
Title
Requesting The Director Of Commerce And Consumer Affairs To Determine The Number Of Multiunit Buildings With Smoke-free Policies, Including Condominiums And Apartment Buildings, And Examine The Types Of Smoke-free Policies In Use.
Sponsors
Rep. Richard Creagan [D] | Rep. Bertrand Kobayashi [D] | Rep. John Mizuno [D] | Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | House | Referred to HSG, CPC, referral sheet 40 |
2020-03-06 | House | Offered |
2020-03-05 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR103 (Same As) 2020-03-11 - Referred to HSG, CPC, referral sheet 40
HCR124 (Carry Over) 2019-03-28 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).
HCR124 (Carry Over) 2019-03-28 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=124&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HCR124_.HTM |