HI HCR123 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HCR123
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-07 - Referred to CPH/HMS.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-07 - Referred to CPH/HMS.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Health To Convene A Task Force To Examine Issues Related To State-licensed And State-certified Care Homes.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Health To Convene A Task Force To Examine Issues Related To State-licensed And State-certified Care Homes.
Sponsors
Rep. Ty Cullen [D] | Sen. Henry Aquino [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-07 | Senate | Referred to CPH/HMS. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 422). |
2017-04-05 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-04-05 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2017-04-05 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1602), recommending adoption. |
2017-04-04 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Choy, DeCoite, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Tokioka, Yamashita, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Gates, Quinlan, Ward. |
2017-03-31 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 04-04-17 10:35AM in conference room 308. |
2017-03-29 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Oshiro, Say, Thielen excused (4). |
2017-03-29 | House | Reported from HLT/HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1514) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. |
2017-03-28 | House | The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Morikawa, Todd, Belatti, Kobayashi; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Oshiro, Tupola. |
2017-03-28 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Todd; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Oshiro, Tupola. |
2017-03-24 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HLT/HUS on Tuesday, 03-28-17 11:05AM in conference room 329. |
2017-03-13 | House | Referred to HLT/HUS, FIN, referral sheet 29 |
2017-03-10 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HCR123 (Carry Over) 2017-04-07 - Referred to CPH/HMS.
HR74 (Same As) 2017-04-05 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HR74 (Same As) 2017-04-05 - Resolution adopted in final form.