HI HCR12 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HCR12
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-29 - The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-29 - The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Convening A Task Force To Address Implementation Of Hawaii's State Law Corollary To Title Ix To Strengthen Hawaii's Efforts To End Campus-based Sexual Violence And Gender Discrimination.
Title
Convening A Task Force To Address Implementation Of Hawaii's State Law Corollary To Title Ix To Strengthen Hawaii's Efforts To End Campus-based Sexual Violence And Gender Discrimination.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-11 - House - House Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-29 | House | The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2021-03-25 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by JHA on Monday, 03-29-21 2:00PM in conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-23 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on JHA as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1). |
2021-03-23 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1176) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to JHA. |
2021-03-11 | House | The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Kapela, Belatti, DeCoite, Ganaden, Gates, Hashimoto, Ohno, Quinlan, Takayama, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Yamane. |
2021-03-09 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by EDN on Thursday, 03-11-21 2:00PM in conference room 309 & 430 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-18 | House | Referred to EDN, JHA, referral sheet 15 |
2021-01-25 | House | Offered |
2021-01-22 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR12 (Carry Over) 2021-03-29 - The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
HR13 (Same As) 2021-03-29 - The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
SCR9 (Same As) 2021-04-08 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
HR13 (Same As) 2021-03-29 - The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
SCR9 (Same As) 2021-04-08 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).