HI HCR119 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HCR119

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - Referred to EEP/WLH, FIN, referral sheet 40
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requesting The United States Marine Corps To Prepare An Environmental Impact Statement For The Shoreline Stabilization Project At The Puuloa Range Training Facility And Urging The Marine Corps To Consider Alternative Approaches To Coastline Management.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requesting The United States Marine Corps To Prepare An Environmental Impact Statement For The Shoreline Stabilization Project At The Puuloa Range Training Facility And Urging The Marine Corps To Consider Alternative Approaches To Coastline Management.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-11HouseReferred to EEP/WLH, FIN, referral sheet 40
2020-03-06HouseOffered
2020-03-05HouseTo be offered.

Same As/Similar To

HR100 (Same As) 2020-03-11 - Referred to EEP/WLH, FIN, referral sheet 40
HCR119 (Carry Over) 2019-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Okimoto, Tokioka voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback