HI HCR116 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Referred to GVO/CPH.
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Convening A Gambling Advisory Group To Examine And Assess The Impacts Of Growing Access To Online And Illegal Gambling In Hawaii.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Convening A Gambling Advisory Group To Examine And Assess The Impacts Of Growing Access To Online And Illegal Gambling In Hawaii.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29SenateReferred to GVO/CPH.
2019-03-29SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 513).
2019-03-28HouseTransmitted to Senate.
2019-03-28HouseAdopted as amended in HD 1 with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Ward voting no (1) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).
2019-03-28HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1900) as amended in HD 1, recommending adoption.
2019-03-22HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Lowen, McKelvey, Morikawa, Takayama; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Thielen; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan, Say, Yamane.
2019-03-20HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 03-22-19 2:10PM in conference room 325.
2019-03-14HouseReferred to JUD, referral sheet 33
2019-03-08HouseOffered

Same As/Similar To

HR106 (Same As) 2019-03-28 - Resolution adopted in final form.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback