HI HCR112 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HCR112
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Department Of Transportation To Assess The Dangers Of Pedestrian Use Of The Shoulder Of Haleakala Highway Between Upper Kimo Drive And Ainakula Road And To Examine Potential Pedestrian Safety Countermeasures.
Title
Urging The Department Of Transportation To Assess The Dangers Of Pedestrian Use Of The Shoulder Of Haleakala Highway Between Upper Kimo Drive And Ainakula Road And To Examine Potential Pedestrian Safety Countermeasures.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2018-04-23 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 817). |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Reported from TRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3807) with recommendation of adoption. |
2018-04-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TRE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Espero, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto. |
2018-04-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE has scheduled a public hearing on 04-18-18 1:15PM in conference room 225. |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Referred to TRE. |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 434). |
2018-04-04 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-04-04 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Choy, Fukumoto, Holt, C. Lee, McKelvey excused (5). |
2018-04-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1777-18), recommending adoption. |
2018-04-03 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Fukumoto, Tupola, Ward. |
2018-03-29 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 04-03-18 10:05AM in conference room 308. |
2018-03-28 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1). |
2018-03-28 | House | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1619-18), recommending referral to FIN. |
2018-03-21 | House | The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Quinlan, Brower, Nakamura, San Buenaventura, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem. |
2018-03-19 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 03-21-18 9:45AM in House conference room 423. |
2018-03-13 | House | Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 39 |
2018-03-09 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HR100 (Same As) 2018-04-04 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HCR112 (Carry Over) 2017-03-29 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Oshiro, Say, Thielen excused (4).
HCR112 (Carry Over) 2017-03-29 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Oshiro, Say, Thielen excused (4).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=112&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HCR112_.HTM |