HI HCR11 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-08 - The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Keohokalole, Acasio; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Fevella.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requesting The Hawaii State Commission On The Status Of Women To Convene A Task Force To Study Missing And Murdered Native Hawaiian Women And Girls.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requesting The Hawaii State Commission On The Status Of Women To Convene A Task Force To Study Missing And Murdered Native Hawaiian Women And Girls.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-08 - Senate - Senate Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-08SenateThe committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Keohokalole, Acasio; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Fevella.
2021-04-05SenateThe committee(s) on HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 04-08-21 1:01PM; Via Videoconference.
2021-04-01SenateReferred to HWN, JDC/WAM.
2021-04-01SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 335).
2021-03-31HouseTransmitted to Senate.
2021-03-31HouseAdopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, Ohno excused (2).
2021-03-31HouseReported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1602), recommending adoption.
2021-03-29HouseThe committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, Lowen, McKelvey, Takumi, Todd, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) LoPresti, Nakamura.
2021-03-25HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by JHA on Monday, 03-29-21 2:00PM in conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
2021-03-24HouseReport adopted. referred to the committee(s) on JHA as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
2021-03-24HouseReported from HHH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1285) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to JHA.
2021-03-23HouseThe committees on HHH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Tam, Gates, Har, Kapela, Nishimoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) LoPresti.
2021-03-18HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by HHH on Tuesday, 03-23-21 9:00AM in conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
2021-02-18HouseReferred to HHH, JHA, referral sheet 15
2021-01-25HouseOffered
2021-01-22HouseTo be offered.

Same As/Similar To

HR12 (Same As) 2021-03-31 - Resolution adopted in final form.
SCR8 (Same As) 2021-03-30 - Referred to HHH, JHA, referral sheet 30

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback