HI HCR109 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Referred to GVO/CPH.
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requesting The Establishment Of A Task Force To Study The Feasibility Of Legalizing Sports Gambling.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requesting The Establishment Of A Task Force To Study The Feasibility Of Legalizing Sports Gambling.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-03SenateReferred to GVO/CPH.
2019-04-03SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 526).
2019-04-02HouseTransmitted to Senate.
2019-04-02HouseAdopted with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Har, Matsumoto, Okimoto, Perruso, Thielen, Ward voting no (6) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Saiki, Todd, Yamane excused (4).
2019-04-02HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1949), recommending adoption.
2019-03-22HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Lowen, McKelvey, Morikawa, Takayama; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Thielen; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan, Say, Yamane.
2019-03-20HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 03-22-19 2:10PM in conference room 325.
2019-03-14HouseReferred to JUD, referral sheet 33
2019-03-08HouseOffered

Same As/Similar To

HR103 (Same As) 2019-04-02 - Resolution adopted in final form.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback