HI HCR108 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HCR108

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Urging The State To Address The Lack Of Language Support In Services, Programs, And Activities Offered By State Government For Persons With Limited English Proficiency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urging The State To Address The Lack Of Language Support In Services, Programs, And Activities Offered By State Government For Persons With Limited English Proficiency.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-23HouseResolution adopted in final form.
2018-04-23HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 816).
2018-04-23SenateReport and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House.
2018-04-23SenateReported from GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3813) with recommendation of adoption.
2018-04-20SenateThe committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in GVO were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Ruderman, K. Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Keith-Agaran.
2018-04-18SenateThe committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 04-20-18 11:00AM in conference room 414.
2018-04-10SenateReferred to GVO.
2018-04-05SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 432).
2018-04-04HouseTransmitted to Senate.
2018-04-04HouseAdopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Choy, Fukumoto, Holt, C. Lee, McKelvey excused (5).
2018-04-04HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1773-18), recommending adoption.
2018-04-03HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Fukumoto, Tupola, Ward.
2018-03-29HouseScheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 04-03-18 10:05AM in conference room 308.
2018-03-28HouseReport adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
2018-03-28HouseReported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1679-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN.
2018-03-27HouseThe committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Holt, Ichiyama, Keohokalole, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Evans.
2018-03-21HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 03-27-18 10:00AM in conference room 309.
2018-03-13HouseReferred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 39
2018-03-09HouseOffered

Same As/Similar To

HR96 (Same As) 2018-04-04 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HCR108 (Carry Over) 2017-03-29 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Oshiro, Say, Thielen excused (4).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback