HI HCR108 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HCR108
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-29 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Oshiro, Say, Thielen excused (4).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-29 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Oshiro, Say, Thielen excused (4).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing The Issuance Of A Sixty-five Year Term, Non-exclusive Easement For Repair And Maintenance Of The Existing Seawall Seaward Of And Fronting Tax Map Key Number: (2) 3-9-11:7; Waiohulu-keokea Homesteads And Beach Lots, Waiohulu-keokea (kihei), Wailuku, Maui, Hawaii.
Title
Authorizing The Issuance Of A Sixty-five Year Term, Non-exclusive Easement For Repair And Maintenance Of The Existing Seawall Seaward Of And Fronting Tax Map Key Number: (2) 3-9-11:7; Waiohulu-keokea Homesteads And Beach Lots, Waiohulu-keokea (kihei), Wailuku, Maui, Hawaii.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-29 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Oshiro, Say, Thielen excused (4). |
2017-03-29 | House | Reported from OMH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1440), recommending referral to FIN. |
2017-03-24 | House | The committees on OMH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Ing, Gates, Creagan, LoPresti, Takayama; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite, Thielen. |
2017-03-21 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Friday, 03-24-17 11:20AM in conference room 312. |
2017-03-21 | House | The committee(s) on OMH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2017-03-17 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by OMH on Tuesday, 03-21-17 10:00AM in conference room 312. |
2017-03-13 | House | Referred to OMH, FIN, referral sheet 29 |
2017-03-10 | House | Offered |
2017-03-09 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR108 (Carry Over) 2017-03-29 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Oshiro, Say, Thielen excused (4).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=108&year=2017 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2017/bills/HCR108_.HTM |