HI HCR108 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-16 - (S) Referred to HTH/ENE/PGM.
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-16 - (S) Referred to HTH/ENE/PGM.
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Health To Conduct A Review And Make Recommendations On The Removal Of Marine Debris Created By The 2011 Tsunami In Japan.
Title
Department of Health; Tsunami Debris; Report
Sponsors
Rep. Cindy Evans [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-16 | (S) Referred to HTH/ENE/PGM. | |
2012-04-16 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 587). | |
2012-04-13 | (H) Transmitted to Senate. | |
2012-04-13 | (H) Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Chang, Kawakami, Oshiro, Tokioka excused (4). | |
2012-04-13 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1739-12), recommending adoption. | |
2012-04-11 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Oshiro, M. Lee, Choy, Cullen, Giugni, Har, Hashem, C. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita, Marumoto, Riviere, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Ichiyama, Jordan, Kawakami. | |
2012-04-09 | (H) Scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 04-11-12 11:15AM in conference room 308. | |
2012-03-27 | (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Carroll, Kawakami, Manahan, McKelvey, Saiki excused (5). | |
2012-03-27 | (H) Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1328-12), recommending referral to FIN. | |
2012-03-22 | (H) The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Coffman, Kawakami, Chang, Har, Ito, Nakashima, Riviere, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Carroll, Herkes. | |
2012-03-20 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 03-22-12 9:00AM in conference room 325. | |
2012-03-15 | (H) Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 47 | |
2012-03-13 | (H) Offered | |
2012-03-12 | (H) To be offered. |