HI HCR107 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HCR107

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Monday 03-16-20 2:10PM in conference room 309.
Pending: House Lower and Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requesting The Complex Area Superintendents Of Baldwin-kekaulike-maui And Hana-lahainaluna-lanai-molokai Complex Areas To Look At The District Boundaries Of All Schools To Address Overcrowding, The Number Of Geographic Exceptions, And The Number Of Hawaiian Immersion Students Attending Outside Of District To Better Align The District Boundaries And Establish Hawaiian Immersion Programs In Other Districts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requesting The Complex Area Superintendents Of Baldwin-kekaulike-maui And Hana-lahainaluna-lanai-molokai Complex Areas To Look At The District Boundaries Of All Schools To Address Overcrowding, The Number Of Geographic Exceptions, And The Number Of Hawaiian Immersion Students Attending Outside Of District To Better Align The District Boundaries And Establish Hawaiian Immersion Programs In Other Districts.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-16HouseThis measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Monday 03-16-20 2:10PM in conference room 309.
2020-03-13HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by LHE/WLH on Monday, 03-16-20 2:10PM in conference room 309.
2020-03-11HouseReferred to LHE/WLH, FIN, referral sheet 40
2020-03-06HouseOffered
2020-03-05HouseTo be offered.

Same As/Similar To

HR88 (Same As) 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Monday 03-16-20 2:10PM in conference room 309.
HCR107 (Carry Over) 2019-04-17 - Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 905) in amended form (SD 1).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback