HI HCR107 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 905) in amended form (SD 1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requesting The Department Of Agriculture To Make Recommendations Regarding A Statewide Program To Address Agricultural Theft And Vandalism.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requesting The Department Of Agriculture To Make Recommendations Regarding A Statewide Program To Address Agricultural Theft And Vandalism.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-17HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 905) in amended form (SD 1).
2019-04-17SenateReport and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House.
2019-04-16SenateOne Day Notice 04-17-19.
2019-04-16SenateReported from EET/AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2163) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1).
2019-04-12SenateThe committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye, J.Keohokalole.
2019-04-12SenateThe committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Ruderman, K. Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) L. Thielen, Fevella.
2019-04-08SenateThe committee(s) on EET/AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 04-12-19 2:00PM in conference room 224.
2019-04-09SenateReferred to EET/AEN.
2019-04-05SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 613).
2019-04-04HouseTransmitted to Senate.
2019-04-04HouseAdopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nishimoto, Quinlan excused (2).
2019-04-04HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2049), recommending adoption.
2019-04-03HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Lowen, McKelvey, Morikawa, Say, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan.
2019-04-01HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by JUD on Wednesday, 04-03-19 2:00PM in conference room 325.
2019-03-28HouseReport adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).
2019-03-28HouseReported from EDB/AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1800), recommending referral to JUD.
2019-03-22HouseThe committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Cachola, Perruso, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Onishi; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Holt.
2019-03-22HouseThe committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kitagawa, Ichiyama, Johanson, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Eli, Quinlan.
2019-03-18HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by EDB/AGR on Friday, 03-22-19 9:30AM in conference room 309.
2019-03-14HouseReferred to EDB/AGR, JUD, referral sheet 33
2019-03-08HouseOffered

Same As/Similar To

HR101 (Same As) 2019-04-04 - Resolution adopted in final form.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback